Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a cooperative housing corporation, a condominium, and a homeowners association to register annually with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; exempting specified common ownership communities from the applicability of the Act; establishing a Common Ownership Community Registry in the Department; requiring the Department to work with any county that maintains a local registry of common ownership communities; establishing a maximum annual registration fee of $10 per year; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1061 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/14/2016
Legislative Date
6/14/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990618/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (48-89)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-39)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/14/2016 6/14/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {990618/1 Adopted 25
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 25
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs) 26
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/16 (Delegate Barve) Adopted 26
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Barve) Adopted 28
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Floor Amendment {713325/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (48-89) 30
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Statewide Registration
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (99-39) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-130.1, 11B-115.2, 14-701 through 14-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM