Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that the amounts on which a certain assessment is calculated for the purpose of recouping a certain health insurance provider fee are for insurance products that are subject to a certain provision of federal law and may be subject to an assessment by the State; requiring that the calculation of the assessment be made without regard to threshold limits established in a certain provision of the Affordable Care Act or the partial exclusion of net premiums provided for in a certain provision of the Affordable Care Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-13)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (125-13) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Finance 37
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM