Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a clerk of a court to provide without charge a copy of specified papers or records requested by an active armed forces member or by the United States government if the copy is to be used in connection with a claim of the member against the United States government; and requiring a clerk of a court to provide without charge a copy of specified marriage records of an active armed forces member that are requested under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0061
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 25
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 27
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM