Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Conference, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048 (SB0060/CH0146)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0065)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0063)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 /CH0069 (SB0087)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0146 (HB0048)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050)
Title
Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0053)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB0052)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 (HB0131/CH0069)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 (SB0060/CH0146) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0050 (SB0061/CH0004) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0052 (SB0065) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0053 (SB0063) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0054 /CH0488 (SB0064) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0131 /CH0069 (SB0087) Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 /CH0146 (HB0048) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Collection of Appearance Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0004 (HB0050) Active Armed Forces Member - Exemption From Payment of Fees for Certain Court Records By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 (HB0053) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 (HB0054/CH0488) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 (HB0052) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0087 (HB0131/CH0069) Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM