Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Produce Safety Program in the Department of Agriculture to reduce the risk of adverse impacts on human health from the consumption of contaminated produce; requiring the Program to conform with certain federal standards for growing, harvesting, packing, and holding produce for human consumption; defining a "covered farm" as one which sold produce, over a 3-year period, with an average annual monetary value of $25,000; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer and enforce the Program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Text - Chapter - Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101 through 16-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM