Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Agriculture, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 /CH0131
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0132
Title
Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 /CH0127
Title
Real Property - Conservation Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recording Notice
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 /CH0128
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0129
Title
Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 /CH0131 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Produce Safety Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1353 /CH0132 Agriculture - Nuisance Insects By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0025 /CH0127 Real Property - Conservation Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recording Notice By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 /CH0128 Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 /CH0129 Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM