Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the termination date from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2020, of a specified increase in the surcharge on specified recordable instruments that the State Court Administrator is required to establish for the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0066
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704464/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Reassigned to Appropriations 9
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {704464/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 52
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM