Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Court Administrator to assess a surcharge on specified fees, charges, and costs in specified cases in the Court of Appeals, Court of Special Appeals, and circuit courts; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court to assess a surcharge in specified civil cases that may not be more than $3 per summary ejectment case and $8 per case for specified civil cases; and requiring the surcharges to be deposited in the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0064
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0108 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {692214/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (57-79)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Failed (59-77)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (82-58)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2015
Legislative Date
5/30/2015
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {692214/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Flanagan) Rejected (57-79) 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Failed (59-77) 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (82-58) 51
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/28/2015 5/30/2015 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-603, 7-102, 7-202, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM