Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegates Jameson, Folden, and Barve
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of aviation gasoline for purposes of the motor fuel tax; providing that "aviation gasoline" is gasoline that is used to propel gasoline-powered aircraft and does not include gasoline used to propel a motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0054
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0406 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/14/2016
Legislative Date
10/14/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {859131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/14/2016 10/14/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33
Text - Third - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 35
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 34
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {859131/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 60
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text - Chapter - Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM