Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Aumann, Barkley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gutierrez, Healey, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Sophocleus, M. Washington, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting owners, employees, and operators of tanning facilities from allowing minors to use tanning devices; and providing penalties of up to $1,000 for specified violations of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0152
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0310 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM