Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Gaming - Home Games
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Buckel, Ebersole, Kipke, Lierman, Luedtke, Morhaim, S. Robinson, Valderrama, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a person to conduct a home game that is a game of chance or skill involving wagering that is conducted in a person's home and allows a player to compete directly against one or more other players; prohibiting a person from conducting a home game involving a player's use of an electronic device that connects to the Internet; and prohibiting a person from benefiting financially in any way, directly or indirectly, other than winnings accrued by participating as a player in a game.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0184
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0305 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2015 1/21/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 13-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM