Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to be the Department of Commerce; repealing the Office of the Secretary of Commerce in the Office of the Governor; repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Commerce employ an Executive Director of the Department; repealing the qualifications and the duties of the Executive Director; providing that the Department of Commerce is the successor of the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0085
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/16/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233894/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 12/16/2015 11/16/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {233894/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Finance 33
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2.5-101, 2-101, 9-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM