Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Commerce, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 (SB0085/CH0338)
Title
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085 /CH0338 (HB0059)
Title
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1112 /CH0320
Title
Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 (SB0085/CH0338) Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 /CH0338 (HB0059) Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and Reorganization By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1112 /CH0320 Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page