Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring registrants providing debt settlement services to obtain and maintain a unique identifier and to transfer registration information to Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry (NMLS) during a certain time period; requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to notify certain registrants of the transfer period; requiring a certain applicant to apply for a registration through NMLS; decreasing fees to $400 from $1,000 for the issuance or renewal of a registration; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213594/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {213594/1 Adopted 27
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Referred Finance 30
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1001, 12-1004, 12-1006, 12-1009 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM