Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore County - Owings Mills High School Stadium
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Morhaim, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend the deadline to June 1, 2014, for the Board of Directors of the Owings Mills High School Sports Boosters, Inc. to present evidence of a specified matching fund and to encumber funds for a specified grant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Prior authorizations that were altered during the 2013 Session were amended into the Omnibus Bill (HB 1372). Individual prior authorizations were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 1372 to alter prior authorizations.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2013
Legislative Date
1/10/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2013 1/10/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM