Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office for Children)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program, which authorizes the Board of Public Works, on the recommendation of the Executive Director of the Governor's Office for Children, to make specified grants to counties, municipal corporations, and nonprofit organizations; repealing provisions of law relating to the purposes, administration, and funding of the Program; repealing provisions of law relating to the uses, terms, and conditions of the grants and the State's recovery of funds expended under the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
9/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2015 9/24/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Hearing 1/26 at 3:30 p.m.
House 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 38
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 38
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 40
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-901 through 8-911 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM