Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Office For Children

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0089
Title
Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0045
Title
State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0102
Title
Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 (HB0446/CH0620)
Title
State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0089 Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0045 State Citizens Review Board for Children - Penalties for Unauthorized Disclosure of Child Protection Case Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0102 Governor's Office for Children and Services to Children By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) Adopted
Finance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0103 (HB0446/CH0620) State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page