Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a specified petition for expungement of specified juvenile records; requiring the court to serve a specified petition on specified victims, family members of specified victims, and a specified State's Attorney; authorizing the court to order the expungement of a specified record under specified circumstances; authorizing the court to grant a specified petition for expungement without a hearing under specified circumstances; authorizing specified persons to file an objection to a petition for expungement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0068
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0282 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
11/12/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {782814/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-41)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378977/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {378977/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {173523/1 Adopted (24-23)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {603628/2 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {603628/3 Adopted (24-23)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-45)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/12/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {782814/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (92-41) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {378977/1 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 58
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {378977/1 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {173523/1 Adopted (24-23) 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {603628/2 Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {603628/3 Adopted (24-23) 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (92-45) 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM