Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period during which the Office of Legislative Audits and the Legislative Auditor are required to audit specified State funds, programs, authorities, units, and a specified local liquor board; requiring the audit of each unit of State government to be conducted at an interval ranging from 3 to 4 years unless the Legislative Auditor determines, on a per case basis, that more frequent audits are required; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m.
House 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 20
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 20
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 22
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 22
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 52
House 3/28/2016 3/23/2016 Returned Passed 55A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-505 )
(   11-101, 11-313, 4.5-203, 4.5-703 )
(   10-201, 10-227, 10-401, 10-414, 10-501, 10-526, 10-806, 10-825, 10-901, 10-911 )
(   16-315 )
(   9-1605, 9-1605.1 )
(   13-1303, 13-2206, 19-201, 19-216 )
(   11-101, 11-408 )
(   30-102, 30-106 )
(   1-309, 2-514 )
(   2-701, 2-702, 3A-506 )
(   2-1220, 9-101, 9-121, 9-1A-34, 9-1A-35 )
(   5-101, 5-215.1, 6-101, 6-212.1, 7-101, 7-211.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM