Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 /CH0477 (SB0206)
Title
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 (HB0140/CH0477)
Title
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Repeal of Sunset Provision and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 /CH0008
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0009
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0140 /CH0477 (SB0206) Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 (HB0140/CH0477) Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Repeal of Sunset Provision and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0506 /CH0008 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 /CH0009 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Rules
2/18/2016 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM