Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain requirement that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation be responsible for certain administrative duties relating to a credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a certain dwelling that is owned by a certain public safety officer under certain circumstances; providing that a certain property tax credit may not exceed the lesser of $2,500 per dwelling or the amount of property tax imposed on the dwelling; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609634/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
House 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {609634/1 Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM