Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assessments And Taxation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089 /CH0654
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0102
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful Collections
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0044
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 /CH0651
Title
Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 /CH0100
Title
Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0101
Title
Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and Resignation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0652
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Return Deadline
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0653
Title
Real Property Tax - Exemption Applications - Approval Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0655
Title
Property Tax - Public Utilities - Assessment Apportionment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0089 /CH0654 Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 /CH0102 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Low Assessments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful Collections By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0009 /CH0044 Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Return of an Original Document - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0010 /CH0651 Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of Property By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 /CH0100 Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 /CH0101 Corporations and Associations - Resident Agent - Quantity and Resignation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0652 Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Return Deadline By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 /CH0653 Real Property Tax - Exemption Applications - Approval Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 /CH0655 Property Tax - Public Utilities - Assessment Apportionment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM