Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Lottery and Gaming Control Agency)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified video lottery facilities located in Worcester County or Allegany County to own or lease specified video lottery terminals and associated equipment and software by March 31, 2020; and altering the distribution of specified proceeds of video lottery terminals if the licensee assumes ownership or the right to lease each video lottery terminal device and the associated equipment and software used by the facility before January 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0495
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-21, 9-1A-27 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM