Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lottery And Gaming Control Agency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445)
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 (SB0495/CH0339)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 (SB0497/CH0446)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0445 (HB0090)
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445) Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0091 (SB0495/CH0339) Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 (SB0497/CH0446) Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Term By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 State Lottery Tickets - Prohibited Acts - Delivery Service By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091) Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0445 (HB0090) Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 /CH0446 (HB0093) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council Membership By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM