Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of the Environment to designate authority for specified sediment control plan and stormwater management plan review and approval.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/15/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-7)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/15/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-7) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 35
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-105, 4-106, 4-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM