Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Trespass to a Vehicle
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly entering a motor vehicle, or any part of a motor vehicle, of another without authorization from the owner or a rightful occupant of the motor vehicle; and providing that a person who violated the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor, shall be considered a rogue and vagabond, and is subject to imprisonment not to exceed 90 days.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM