Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Budget and Management)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law governing the experience, education, and other qualifications for individuals appointed as budget analysts by the Secretary of Budget and Management.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
9/20/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-19)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/20/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 37
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (113-19) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page