Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott, Afzali, Bates, Beitzel, Cluster, Elliott, Fisher, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hogan, Impallaria, Jacobs, McComas, McConkey, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, Otto, Ready, Schulz, Smigiel, Stifler, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012; repealing specified provisions of law relating to the adoption of specified growth tier designations by specified local jurisdictions; repealing a prohibition against the sale or development of specified land unless specified documentation is provided to the Department of the Environment; repealing the requirement that under specified circumstances a local jurisdiction alter the contents of a specified plan; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0391
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0236 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2013 1/16/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1110, 9-206 )
(   1-401, 1-501 through 1-509, 5-104, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM