Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Housing and Community Development)
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering homebuyer education requirements for a loan recipient in the Down Payment and Settlement Expense Loan Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; establishing specified requirements for the Department's homebuyer education requirements; providing that specified provisions do not alter or preempt the authority of a political subdivision to establish homebuyer education or counseling requirements for a down payment assistance program operated by the political subdivision; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550318/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {550318/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Rules 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/30/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   4-302, 4-308, 4-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page