Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Court Administrator to assess a surcharge on specified fees, charges, and costs in specified cases in the Court of Appeals, Court of Special Appeals, and circuit courts; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court to assess a surcharge in specified civil cases; and requiring the surcharges to be deposited in the Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0032
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2014
Legislative Date
1/09/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2014 1/09/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/09/2014 1/09/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-603, 7-102, 7-202, 7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM