Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing the Maryland Mold Remediation Services Act to terminate on July 1, 2019 in accordance with provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law); extending to July 1, 2019, the deadline for licensure under the Maryland Mold Remediation Services Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0183
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21
Text - Third - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 23
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 24
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Text - Chapter - Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-707, 8-718 )
(   2008, 2011 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM