Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Maryland Insurance Administration, and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Administration, be subject to a preliminary evaluation in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law); requiring the Administration to submit specified reports to specified committees of the General Assembly and the Department of Legislative Services at specified times; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Finance 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Text - Chapter - Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page