Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the Elevator Safety Review Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2029, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that govern the Board be performed on or before a specified date; requiring the Board to study, make recommendations, and report its findings on specified matters on or before October 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21
Text - Third - Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 23
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Finance 24
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text - Chapter - Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-842 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM