Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Construction Contracts - Change Orders (State Procurement Change Order Fairness Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Branch, Bromwell, Kipke, Miele, W. Miller, Oaks, Ready, Reznik, Szeliga, Vaughn, and Walker
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a unit from requiring a prime contractor and a prime contractor from requiring a subcontractor to begin change order work under a contract until the procurement officer for the unit issues a specified written change order; requiring, under specified circumstances, a unit to pay an invoice for work performed and accepted under a change order within 30 days after the unit receives the invoice in accordance with a specified provision of law; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0708
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015, January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {326987/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954838/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {326987/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 62
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {954838/1 Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Conway) Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM