Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Budget - Department of Budget and Management - Statement of Dedicated State Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Ciliberti, Gutierrez, Hill, Jalisi, Jameson, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lierman, McCray, Patterson, B. Robinson, Smith, Vogt, West, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to publish on the Department of Budget and Management's Web site, in a machine-readable format, a specified itemized statement, linked to the proposed State budget, of revenues collected by the State that are dedicated by law to a special fund.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429434/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 28
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Second Reading Passed 28
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 30
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {429434/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 53
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM