Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Residential Retention Property Tax Credit - Modification
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from a prohibition against specified homeowners receiving specified property tax credits under specified circumstances; and providing for the application and termination of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0186
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/31/2015 3/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM