Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Parrott, Barve, Cardin, Ivey, and Summers
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from willfully and knowingly preventing, hindering, or delaying a person who has a lawful right to sign a petition from signing a petition through the use of fraud, duress, or force.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {613222/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {613222/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/10/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {613222/1 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 58
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {613222/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM