Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime Wages
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the applicability of an overtime wage provision of law to exclude, under specified circumstances, a specified employer that is subject to Title II of the federal Railway Labor Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0405
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213595/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {213595/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Finance 31
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-415, 3-420 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM