Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the BayStat Program to be the BayTrack Program; and renaming the BayStat Subcabinet to be the Bay Cabinet.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-2A-01, 8-2A-03, 8-2A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM