Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 /CH0102
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Program Open Space - Apportionment Formula and Committee By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0126 /CH0102 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0129 BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - Renaming By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0030 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM