Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a petition for expungement of a criminal charge that has been transferred to the juvenile court to be filed in the court of original jurisdiction from which the order of transfer was entered.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0087
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM