Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsored by
Chair, Appropriations Committee and Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Resources)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring specified responsibilities relating to the Interagency Council on Homelessness and the Homeless Women - Crisis Shelter Home Program from the Department of Human Resources to the Department of Housing and Community Development; providing for the transfer of the functions, powers, and duties of the Bureau of Homeless Services; requiring the Council to appoint a specified transition team; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text - Chapter - Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2101, 4-2101 through 4-2108, 4-2103, 4-2201, 4-2201 through 4-2209, 4-2208 )
(   6-417 through 6-424, 6-430 through 6-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM