Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 /CH0205
Title
Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 /CH0105
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 /CH0205 Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0134 /CH0105 Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0027 Child Abuse and Neglect - Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM