Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of Identity
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Afzali, Aumann, Bates, Beitzel, Boteler, Cluster, Costa, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Kach, Krebs, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, W. Miller, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Otto, Ready, Schuh, Smigiel, Stifler, Stocksdale, Szeliga, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an election judge to establish a voter's identity by requiring the voter to present specified proof of identity; requiring a voter to vote a provisional ballot if the voter is unable to provide specified proof of identity; prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully voting or attempting to vote under a false form of identification; and making conforming and clarifying changes.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0113 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-310, 16-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM