Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers and Public Safety Officers
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Delegates Anderson, Clippinger, Glenn, Haynes, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, B. Robinson, Carter, Rosenberg, Branch, Hammen, Lierman, and Metzgar
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified property tax credit for specified residential real property in Harford County owned by specified surviving spouses or specified cohabitants; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a specified property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a specified dwelling in Baltimore City that is owned by a specified public safety officer under specified circumstances; providing that the credit may not exceed $2,500 per dwelling; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0552
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {945763/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {879830/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {945763/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {879830/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-210, 9-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM