Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0559 (SB0552/CH0558)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers and Public Safety Officers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0484
Title
Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground Rent
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Law Enforcement Officer - Misdemeanor - Hearing and Emergency Suspension
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Extension of Time for Review and Final Order by Chief
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Baby Diapers - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262 (SB0829)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1579
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 (HB1262)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0146 /CH0559 (SB0552/CH0558) Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers and Public Safety Officers By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0376 Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 /CH0484 Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground Rent By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 Law Enforcement Officer - Misdemeanor - Hearing and Emergency Suspension By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Extension of Time for Review and Final Order by Chief By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 Sales and Use Tax - Baby Diapers - Exemption By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1262 (SB0829) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1579 Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0829 (HB1262) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page