Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating the Office of the Secretary of Transportation as the State Safety Oversight Authority for the Maryland Transit Administration's light rail transit system and Metro subway in accordance with federal law; requiring the deputy secretary of transportation or the deputy secretary's designee to exercise safety authority over the Administration's light rail transit system and Metro subway; and authorizing the Office of the Secretary to adopt regulations to carry out its safety oversight authority.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Rules 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text - Chapter - Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority
(   2-102, 7-203.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page