Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Adams, Arentz, Buckel, Cluster, Folden, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Ready, Rey, Saab, Szeliga, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from personal property tax for property that is owned by a business that has organized under the laws of Maryland during the current tax year or that relocates its headquarters to Maryland during the current tax year; exempting specified personal property from a property tax imposed by a county or municipality for all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; providing that specified personal property remains subject to a county or municipal corporation property tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-245, 7-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM