Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the requirement that insurers that issue or deliver medical professional liability insurance policies in the State offer, in addition to the basic policy, additional policies with certain deductibles to insurers that issue or deliver a policy with an annual premium of $5,000 or more.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27
Text - Third - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Referred Finance 30
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text - Chapter - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM