Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bohanan, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Burns, Cane, Cardin, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Elliott, Feldman, Frick, Frush, Gaines, George, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hershey, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, James, Jameson, Jones, Kach, Kaiser, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Luedtke, McConkey, McDonough, A. Miller, Mitchell, Morhaim, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Norman, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Serafini, Smigiel, Stein, Stukes, Summers, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, Wood, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim November 1 as Maryland Emancipation Day.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0042
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM